US HR318 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 122-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that (1) clean water is a national priority, and (2) the 2020 final rule titled The Navigable Waters Protection Rule: Definition of "Waters of the United States" should not be withdrawn or vacated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that clean water is a national priority and that the April 21, 2020, Navigable Waters Protection Rule should not be withdrawn or vacated.

Sponsors

Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA]Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]
Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC]Rep. Yvette Herrell [R-NM]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]
Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA]Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT]Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]
Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX]
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL]
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL]
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]
Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]
Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Diana Harshbarger [R-TN]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]
Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL]Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN]Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA]
Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA]Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA]
Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]
Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Julia Letlow [R-LA]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2021-04-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR17 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text: CR S178)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback