US HR268 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the trafficking of illicit fentanyl into the United States from Mexico and China. Expresses the sense of the Senate that: the use of illicit fentanyl in the United States and the resulting overdose deaths are a public health crisis; the trafficking of illicit fentanyl into the United States, especially by transnational criminal organizations, is a problem that requires close cooperation between the U.S. government and the governments of Mexico and China; and all three such countries have a shared interest in, and responsibility for, stopping the production of illicit fentanyl and its trafficking into the United States. Calls for the United States to: support the efforts by the governments of Mexico and China to stop such production and trafficking into the United States; take further measures to reduce and prevent heroin and fentanyl consumption through enhanced enforcement to reduce the illegal supply and increased use of evidence-based prevention, treatment, and recovery services; and use its broad diplomatic and law enforcement resources, in partnership with the governments of China and Mexico, to stop such production and trafficking.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the trafficking of illicit fentanyl into the United States from Mexico and China.
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR10 (Related) 2017-01-10 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SR83 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR83 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Asia
China
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health promotion and preventive care
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mexico
Organized crime
China
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health promotion and preventive care
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mexico
Organized crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/268/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres268/BILLS-115hres268ih.pdf |