US HR259 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-10)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing concern and condemnation over the political, economic, social, and humanitarian crisis in Venezuela. Urges the government of Venezuela to heed the calls of the international community to: (1) hold free, fair, and open elections; (2) release all political prisoners, including U.S. citizens; (3) respect the constitutional rights of the National Assembly; and (4) open a channel for international humanitarian assistance and medicines. Calls for Organization of American States (OAS) member states to continue: (1) efforts to support the principles of the Inter-American Democratic Charter, regardless of Venezuela's intent to withdraw from the OAS; and (2) calls for the Venezuelan government to hold free and fair elections and release all political prisoners in a timely manner. Recognizes the leadership of OAS Secretary General Luis Almagro in building a coalition of OAS member states in support of democracy and human rights for the Venezuelan people. Encourages the President of the United States to prioritize: (1) a resolution of the political, economic, social, and humanitarian crisis in Venezuela; and (2) an effective response to the growing regional refugee crisis in Venezuela through multilateral cooperation with partners at the OAS and United Nations and through targeted sanctions against individuals responsible for the deterioration of democratic institutions and the rule of law.
Title
Expressing concern and condemnation over the political, economic, social, and humanitarian crisis in Venezuela.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 667 (Y: 419 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 8 (Roll no. 667). (text: CR 12/5/2017 CR H9659-9660) |
2017-12-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9730-9731) |
2017-12-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-12-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 259. |
2017-12-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9659-9663) |
2017-12-05 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended). |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela