US HR216 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating the Plastics Industry Association on its 80th anniversary. Congratulates the Plastics Industry Association on its 80th anniversary.
Title
Congratulating the Plastics Industry Association on its 80th anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR64 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1398)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Manufacturing
Science and engineering education
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Manufacturing
Science and engineering education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/216/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres216/BILLS-115hres216ih.pdf |