US HR203 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-5)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honors and recognizes the contributions of members of the Armed Forces who served in Vietnam. Encourages the people of the United States to observe "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" with appropriate ceremonies and activities.
Title
Expressing support for designation of a "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HR234 (Related) 2009-03-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR89 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4008; text as passed Senate: CR S4008; text of measure as introduced: CR S4005)
SR451 (Related) 2010-03-19 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1780)
SR89 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4008; text as passed Senate: CR S4008; text of measure as introduced: CR S4005)
SR451 (Related) 2010-03-19 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1780)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/203/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres203/BILLS-111hres203ih.pdf |