US HR201 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-12)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support to the Government of Argentina for its investigation into the terrorist bombing of the Embassy of Israel in Buenos Aires on March 17, 1992. Calls on the U.S. government to assist the government of Argentina so that the perpetrators of the attacks on the Israeli embassy in Buenos Aires in 1992 and the Argentine-Israeli Mutual Association in Buenos Aires in 1994 may be brought to justice. Determines that such attacks constitute an affront to humanity and the values of civilized society and remind us that the international community must work together to defeat international terrorism and its state sponsors, such as Iran. Urges the government of Iran to take steps toward fully complying with investigations by the government of Argentina, including immediately providing all available information from the Iranian government regarding such attacks.
Title
Expressing support to the Government of Argentina for its investigation into the terrorist bombing of the Embassy of Israel in Buenos Aires on March 17, 1992.
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2086) |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Argentina
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Israel
Latin America
Middle East
Religion
Terrorism
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Israel
Latin America
Middle East
Religion
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/201/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres201/BILLS-115hres201ih.pdf |