US HR182 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of School Social Work Week. Honors the contributions of school social workers to the success of students in schools.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of March 1 through March 8, 2009, as "School Social Work Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. John Hall [D-NY] | Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] |
Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Kennedy [D-RI] |
Rep. Carolyn Kilpatrick [D-MI] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Miller [D-NC] | Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wexler [D-FL] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. | |
2009-03-24 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-03-24 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 149). (text: CR H3769) | |
2009-03-24 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3773) | |
2009-03-24 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-03-24 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 182. | |
2009-03-24 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3769-3770) | |
2009-03-24 | Ms. Woolsey moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1091 (Same As) 2010-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SR58 (Related) 2009-02-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2595-2596)
SR426 (Related) 2010-03-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1129)
SR58 (Related) 2009-02-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2595-2596)
SR426 (Related) 2010-03-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1129)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Teaching, teachers, curricula