US HR1541 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of Jumpstart's Read for the Record Day. Commends Jumpstart's Read for the Record, which is now in its fifth year. (Jumpstart is a national nonprofit early childhood education organization.) Encourages adults to: (1) join children in creating the world's largest shared reading experience; and (2) show their support for early literacy and Jumpstart's early education programming for young children in low-income communities.
Title
Expressing support for designation of October 7, 2010, as national "Jumpstart's Read for the Record Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Anh Cao [R-LA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Deborah Halvorson [D-IL] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] |
Rep. Suzanne Kosmas [D-FL] | Rep. Betsy Markey [D-CO] | Rep. Harry Mitchell [D-AZ] | Rep. Scott Murphy [D-NY] |
Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Ed Pastor [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. Harry Teague [D-NM] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-13 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. | |
2010-07-20 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HR741 (Related) 2009-10-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR593 (Related) 2010-09-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7299; text as passed Senate: CR S7299)
SR621 (Related) 2010-09-14 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7094)
SR593 (Related) 2010-09-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7299; text as passed Senate: CR S7299)
SR621 (Related) 2010-09-14 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7094)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Literacy and language arts
Preschool education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Congressional tributes
Education
Literacy and language arts
Preschool education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/1541/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres1541/BILLS-111hres1541ih.pdf |