US HR152 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that clean water is a national priority, and that the June 29, 2015, Waters of the United States Rule should be withdrawn or vacated. Calls for the nullification of the final rule titled "Clean Water Rule: Definition of 'Waters of the United States,'" about the scope of the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act). The Environmental Protection Agency and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers issued the rule on June 29, 2015.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that clean water is a national priority, and that the June 29, 2015, Waters of the United States Rule should be withdrawn or vacated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR12 (Same As) 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Army Corps of Engineers
Congressional oversight
Department of Defense
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Lakes and rivers
Water quality
Wetlands
Army Corps of Engineers
Congressional oversight
Department of Defense
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Lakes and rivers
Water quality
Wetlands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/152/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres152/BILLS-115hres152ih.pdf |