US HR152 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 233 - 181 (Roll no. 127). (text: CR H1775)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 233 - 181 (Roll no. 127). (text: CR H1775)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 132) providing for the expenses of certain committees of the House of Representatives in the One Hundred Fourteenth Congress, and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (S.J. Res. 8) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to representation case procedures. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 132) providing for the expenses of certain committees of the House of Representatives in the One Hundred Fourteenth Congress, and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (S.J. Res. 8) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to representation case procedures.
Title
Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 132) providing for the expenses of certain committees of the House of Representatives in the One Hundred Fourteenth Congress, and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (S.J. Res. 8) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Labor Relations Board relating to representation case procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 233 N: 181 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 233 N: 181 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Motion to Table S.J.Res. 8 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 233 N: 181 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On the Motion to Table S.J.Res. 8 (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 233 - 181 (Roll no. 127). (text: CR H1775) |
2015-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-03-19 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 181 (Roll no. 126). (consideration: CR H1781) |
2015-03-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 152. |
2015-03-19 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1775-1782) |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 16. |
2015-03-17 | House | The rule waives all point of order agains consideration of the resolu tions. The rule provides that the amendment printed in the report shall be adopted, and H.Res. 132, as amended shall be considered as read and shall not be subject to a demand for division of the question. |
2015-03-17 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-45, by Ms. Foxx. |
Same As/Similar To
HR132 (Related) 2015-03-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR7 (Related) 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR8 (Related) 2015-05-05 - Motion to table the veto message to accompany S. J. Res. 8 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 3. Record Vote Number: 172. (consideration: CR S2644)
SJR7 (Related) 2015-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR8 (Related) 2015-05-05 - Motion to table the veto message to accompany S. J. Res. 8 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 96 - 3. Record Vote Number: 172. (consideration: CR S2644)