US HR1463 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, H. Res. 1463 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8504; text: CR H8504-8505)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-15 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, H. Res. 1463 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8504; text: CR H8504-8505)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals and ideals of "move over" laws.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of "move over" laws.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1464, H. Res. 1463 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H8504; text: CR H8504-8505) |
2022-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2022-11-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-11-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1464 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1052 (Related) 2022-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SR734 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S3865)
HR1052 (Related) 2022-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SR734 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S3865)