US HR1420 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on October 9, 2022, as "National Wildlife Refuge Week".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week beginning on October 9, 2022, as "National Wildlife Refuge Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-09-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR415 (Related) 2021-10-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6993; text: CR S7004-7005)
SR814 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704-6705; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5557)
SR814 (Related) 2022-11-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6704-6705; text: 9/29/2022 CR S5557)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1420/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1420/BILLS-117hres1420ih.pdf |