US HR134 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-21)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Condemning the military coup that took place on February 1, 2021, in Burma and the Burmese military detention of civilian leaders, calling for the release of all those detained and for those elected to serve in Parliament to resume their duties, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the military coup that took place on February 1, 2021, in Burma and the Burmese military detention of civilian leaders, calling for the release of all those detained and for those elected to serve in Parliament to resume their duties, and for other purposes.

Sponsors

Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA]Rep. James Baird [R-IN]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA]Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Young Kim [R-CA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]

Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution (Y: 398 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-03-19HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 14, 1 Present (Roll no. 97). (text: CR 03/18/2021 H1563-1564)
2021-03-19HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1601-1602)
2021-03-18HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-03-18HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 134.
2021-03-18HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1563-1566)
2021-03-18HouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
2021-02-25HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-02-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback