US HR1301 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of July 30, 2022, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of July 30, 2022, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR578 (Related) 2021-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR324 (Related) 2021-07-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5112; text: CR S5108-5109)
SR723 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3698-3699)
SR324 (Related) 2021-07-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5112; text: CR S5108-5109)
SR723 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3698-3699)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1301/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1301/BILLS-117hres1301ih.pdf |