US HR1266 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the President to transmit certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to any initiative or negotiations regarding Iran's nuclear program.
Title
Requesting the President to transmit certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to any initiative or negotiations regarding Iran's nuclear program.
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] |
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Mayra Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] |
Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 101. |
2022-09-20 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 117-479. |
2022-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported Adversely (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 22. |
2022-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |