US HR1261 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry requesting the President to provide certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to communications and directives with the Federal Trade Commission.
Title
Of inquiry requesting the President to provide certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to communications and directives with the Federal Trade Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121. |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-511. |
2022-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported Adversely by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 18. |
2022-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-21 | House | Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce Discharged. |
2022-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |