US HR1176 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Rule XXI (Restrictions on Certain Bills) of the Rules of the House of Representatives to make it out of order in the House to consider legislation reported or not reported by any committee, or any amendment or conference report (including any joint explanatory statement), that includes a congressional earmark or limited tax or tariff benefit. Requires the House Committee on the Budget to determine whether a measure or matter contains any congressional earmark or limited tax or tariff benefit, relying, if it chooses, on information supplied by the Congressional Budget Office (CBO).
Title
Amending the Rules of the House of Representatives to ban congressional earmarks, limited tax benefits, and limited tariff benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Hodes [D-NH] | Rep. Walter Minnick [D-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Referred to the House Committee on Rules. |
Same As/Similar To
HR276 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Referred to House Standards of Official Conduct
HR1101 (Related) 2010-02-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
HR1177 (Related) 2010-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
SB2990 (Related) 2010-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HR1101 (Related) 2010-02-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
HR1177 (Related) 2010-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
SB2990 (Related) 2010-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Appropriations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Legislative rules and procedure
Tariffs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/1176/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres1176/BILLS-111hres1176ih.pdf |