US HR114 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - NOTIFICATION OF INTENT TO OFFER RESOLUTION - Mr. Robert Garcia (CA) notified the House of his intent to offer a privileged resolution pursuant to clause 2(a)(1) of rule IX. The Chair announced that a determination will be made at the time designated for consideration of the resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

In the matter of George Santos.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In the matter of George Santos.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-17 - House - On Motion to Refer RC# 217 (Y: 221 N: 204 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-28HouseNOTIFICATION OF INTENT TO OFFER RESOLUTION - Mr. Robert Garcia (CA) notified the House of his intent to offer a privileged resolution pursuant to clause 2(a)(1) of rule IX. The Chair announced that a determination will be made at the time designated for consideration of the resolution.
2023-05-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-05-17HouseOn motion to refer Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 204, 7 Present ) (Roll No. 217).
2023-05-17HouseThe previous question on the motion to refer was ordered without objection.
2023-05-17HouseMr. D'Esposito moved to refer to Ethics.
2023-05-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 114.
2023-05-17HouseConsidered as privileged matter.
2023-05-17HouseQUESTION OF THE PRIVILEGES OF THE HOUSE - Mr. Robert Garcia (CA) rose to a question of the privileges of the House and offered the resolution. The Chair directed the Clerk to report the resolution. Upon examination of the resolution, the Chair determined that the resolution did constitute a question of the privileges of the House.
2023-05-16HouseNOTIFICATION OF INTENT TO OFFER RESOLUTION - Mr. Robert Garcia (CA) notified the House of his intent to offer a privileged resolution pursuant to clause 2(a)(1) of rule IX. The Chair announced that a determination will be made at the time designated for consideration of the resolution.
2023-02-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ethics.
2023-02-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR650 (Related) 2023-08-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ethics.
HR773 (Related) 2023-11-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR878 (Same As) 2023-12-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback