US HR1039 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of April 13, 2020, as "National Borinqueneers Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of April 13, 2020, as "National Borinqueneers Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR641 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4102-4103; text: CR S4144-4145)
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Puerto Rico
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Caribbean area
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Puerto Rico
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1039/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1039/BILLS-116hres1039ih.pdf |