US HJR87 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Approval, Disapproval and Promulgation of Air Quality Implementation Plans; Partial Approval and Partial Disapproval of Air Quality Implementation Plans and Federal Implementation Plan; Utah; Revisions to Regional Haze State Implementation Plan; Federal Implementation Plan for Regional Haze". This joint resolution nullifies the rule issued by the Environmental Protection Agency on July 5, 2016, relating to a revised state implementation plan for regional haze that was submitted by Utah under the Clean Air Act.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "Approval, Disapproval and Promulgation of Air Quality Implementation Plans; Partial Approval and Partial Disapproval of Air Quality Implementation Plans and Federal Implementation Plan; Utah; Revisions to Regional Haze State Implementation Plan; Federal Implementation Plan for Regional Haze".
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR38 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1781)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Utah
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Utah
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-joint-resolution/87/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hjres87/BILLS-115hjres87ih.pdf |