US HJR79 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-07-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to a national emergency declared by the President on May 11, 2004.
Title
Relating to a national emergency declared by the President on May 11, 2004.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2023-07-18 - House - On Passage RC# 337 (Y: 24 N: 394 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-07-18 | House | On passage Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 394 (Roll no. 337). (text: CR H3668) |
2023-07-18 | House | Failed of passage/not agreed to in House On passage Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 394 (Roll no. 337). (text: CR H3668) |
2023-07-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3684) |
2023-07-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. J. Res. 79, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Wilson (SC) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2023-07-18 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House. |
2023-07-18 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the previous order of the House of July 17, 2023, the House proceeded with 30 minutes of debate on H. J. Res. 79. |
2023-07-18 | House | Considered pursuant to a previous order. (consideration: CR H3668-3670) |
2023-07-18 | House | Consideration initiated pursuant to a previous order. |
2023-07-17 | House | ORDER OF PROCEDURE - Mr. Steil asked unanimous consent that it be in order at any time through July 20, 2023, to consider in the House, H. J. Res. 79 if called up by the chair of the Committee on Foreign Affairs or his designee; that the joint resolution be considered as read; that the previous question be considered as ordered on the joint resolution to final passage without intervening motion except 30 minutes of debate equally divided among and controlled by Mr. McCaul, Mr. Meeks, and Mr. Gaetz or their respective designees; and that the provisions of section 202 of the National Emergencies Act (50 U.S.C. 1622) shall not apply to the joint resolution through July 20, 2023. Agreed to without objection. |
2023-07-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |