US HJR77 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168 pursuant to Public Law 112-25, Section 301(a)(2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-15 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168 pursuant to Public Law 112-25, Section 301(a)(2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproves of the President's exercise of authority to increase the debt limit.
Title
Relating to the disapproval of the President's exercise of authority to increase the debt limit, as submitted under section 3101A of title 31, United States Code, on August 2, 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-14 - House - On Passage (Y: 232 N: 186 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 168 pursuant to Public Law 112-25, Section 301(a)(2). |
2011-09-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-09-14 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 232 - 186, 2 Present (Roll no. 706). (text: CR H6156) |
2011-09-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the statute. (consideration: CR H6167) |
2011-09-14 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to section 3101A(c)(4) of title 31, United States Code, the joint resolution was considered as read, and the previous question was considered as ordered on the joint resolution without intervening motion except 2 hours of debate equally divided and controlled. |
2011-09-14 | House | On motion to proceed to consideration of H.J.Res. 77 Agreed to by voice vote. |
2011-09-14 | House | MOTION TO PROCEED - Pursuant to section 3 of H.Res. 392, Mr. Reed was recognized to offer a motion to proceed to the consideration of H.J.Res. 77. Subsequently the Chair announced that pursuant to section 3101A(c)(3) of title 31, United States Code, the motion was not debatable, and put the question. |
2011-09-14 | House | Called up under the provisions of rule H. Res. 392. (consideration: CR H6156-6168) |
2011-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 134. |
2011-09-12 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2011-09-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR25 (Same As) 2011-09-08 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 52. Record Vote Number: 130.
HJR98 (Related) 2012-01-26 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 52. Record Vote Number: 2. (consideration: CR S95)
HJR98 (Related) 2012-01-26 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure rejected in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 52. Record Vote Number: 2. (consideration: CR S95)