US HJR74 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 83-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "National Ambient Air Quality Standards for Ozone". Nullifies the Environmental Protection Agency's rule published on October 26, 2015, that revises the primary and secondary national ambient air quality standards for ozone.
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "National Ambient Air Quality Standards for Ozone".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-11-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR25 (Same As) 2015-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-joint-resolution/74/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hjres74/BILLS-114hjres74ih.pdf |