US HJR50 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to limit the number of terms a Representative or Senator may serve. This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment limiting Members of the Senate to two terms and Members of the House of Representatives to six terms.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to limit the number of terms a Representative or Senator may serve.
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR13 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR20 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR101 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR134 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR20 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR101 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR134 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-joint-resolution/50/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hjres50/BILLS-115hjres50ih.pdf |