US HJR43 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 147-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-23. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 147-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-23. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule submitted by Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to compliance with title X requirements by project recipients in selecting subrecipients. This joint resolution nullifies a Department of Health and Human Services rule regarding subrecipients of family planning grants. (Under the rule, grant recipients may prohibit an entity from receiving a subaward only for reasons related to the entity's ability to provide family planning services.)
Title
Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule submitted by Secretary of Health and Human Services relating to compliance with title X requirements by project recipients in selecting subrecipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 100 (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 101 (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - On passage RC# 99 (Y: 230 N: 188 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 101 (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - On passage RC# 99 (Y: 230 N: 188 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-23. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 50. Record Vote Number: 101. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S2122-2138) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 50. Record Vote Number: 100. (consideration: CR S2122) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-02-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-16 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 230 - 188 (Roll no. 99). (text: CR H1268) |
2017-02-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1279-1280) |
2017-02-16 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 43, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. DeGette demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced. |
2017-02-16 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-02-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 43. |
2017-02-16 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017. |
2017-02-16 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 123. (consideration: CR H1268-1278) |
2017-02-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 123 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.J.Res. 43 and H.J.Res. 69; and provides for proceedings during the period from February 17, 2017, through February 24, 2017. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR39 (Related) 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR123 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR13 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR123 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR13 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Family planning and birth control
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding