US HJR37 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-11. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Became Public Law No: 115-11. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Defense, the General Services Administration, and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration relating to the Federal Acquisition Regulation. This joint resolution nullifies the rule finalized by the Department of Defense, the General Services Administration, and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) on August 25, 2016, relating to revising the Federal Acquisition Regulation to implement Executive Order 13673 concerning contractor compliance with labor laws.
Title
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Defense, the General Services Administration, and the National Aeronautics and Space Administration relating to the Federal Acquisition Regulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 81 (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 80 (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - On passage RC# 76 (Y: 236 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 80 (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - On passage RC# 76 (Y: 236 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-11. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 48. Record Vote Number: 81. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S1591-1601) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 80. (consideration: CR S1564-1571) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-02-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-02 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 236 - 187 (Roll no. 76). (text: CR H907) |
2017-02-02 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H915-916) |
2017-02-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 37. |
2017-02-02 | House | Both resolutions are closed to amendments. Both resolutions provides for one hour of general debate, and provide for one motion to recommit. |
2017-02-02 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 74. (consideration: CR H907-916) |
2017-02-02 | House | Rule H. Res. 74 passed House. |
2017-01-31 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 74 Reported to House. Both resolutions are closed to amendments. Both resolutions provides for one hour of general debate, and provide for one motion to recommit. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR74 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR12 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SJR12 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Age discrimination
Congressional oversight
Department of Defense
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
General Services Administration
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Labor-management relations
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Public contracts and procurement
Worker safety and health
Age discrimination
Congressional oversight
Department of Defense
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
General Services Administration
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Labor-management relations
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Public contracts and procurement
Worker safety and health