US HJR24 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to limit the number of years an individual may serve as a Member of Congress. This joint resolution proposes a constitutional amendment limiting the total period an individual may serve as a Member of Congress to 12 years.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to limit the number of years an individual may serve as a Member of Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR7 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR134 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR134 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-joint-resolution/24/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hjres24/BILLS-115hjres24ih.pdf |