US HJR2 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 227-16)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-30 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-512.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-30 - Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-512.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - Prohibits outlays for a fiscal year (except those for repayment of debt principal) from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year (except those derived from borrowing) unless Congress, by a three-fifths rollcall vote of each chamber, authorizes a specific excess of outlays over receipts. Requires a three-fifths rollcall vote of each chamber to increase the public debt limit. Directs the President to submit a balanced budget to Congress annually. Prohibits any bill to increase revenue from becoming law unless approved by a majority of each chamber by rollcall vote. Authorizes waivers of these provisions when a declaration of war is in effect or under other specified circumstances involving military conflict.
Title
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-18 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 261 N: 165 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-30 | House | Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights and Human Rights. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-512. |
2011-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 261 - 165 (Roll no. 858). |
2011-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on H.J. Res. 2. When proceedings were postponed on Thursday, November 17, 2011, 2 hours and 42 minutes of debate remained. |
2011-11-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7841-7874) |
2011-11-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to section 2 of H. Res. 466, further consideration of this motion is postponed. |
2011-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House continued with debate on H.J. Res. 2. |
2011-11-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 466, the House proceeded with 5 hours of debate on H.J. Res. 2. |
2011-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7782-7805; text of measure as introduced: CR H7782) |
2011-11-17 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended. |
2011-11-17 | House | Rule H. Res. 466 passed House. |
2011-11-15 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 466 Reported to House. The resolution authorizes the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules through the legislative day of Friday, November 18, 2011, relating to H.J.Res. 2, proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States. The resolution provides that debate on such a motion shall be extended to five hours. Finally, the resolution provides that the Chair may postpone further consideration of such a motion pursuant to the resolution to a time designated by the Speaker. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution. |
2011-01-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1 (Related) 2011-06-23 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 49.
HJR4 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR5 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR10 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR11 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR14 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR18 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR41 (Related) 2011-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HR466 (Related) 2011-11-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR87 (Related) 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR89 (Related) 2011-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR4 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR5 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR10 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR11 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR14 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR18 (Related) 2011-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR41 (Related) 2011-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HR466 (Related) 2011-11-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR87 (Related) 2011-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
HJR89 (Related) 2011-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure