US HJR10 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-9. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-9. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the reappointment of David M. Rubenstein as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution. Reappoints David M. Rubenstein as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.
Title
Providing for the reappointment of David M. Rubenstein as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Xavier Becerra [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-9. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 3/26/2015 S2088) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-03-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-03-26 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2092) |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2092) |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. (consideration: CR H2092) |
2015-03-26 | House | Mr. Davis, Rodney asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H2092) |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SJR3 (Related) 2015-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Federal officials
Government operations and politics
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Government operations and politics
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution