US HCR97 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make corrections in the enrollment of H.B. 1. Directs the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make corrections in the enrollment of H.B. 1 (Tax Cuts and Jobs Act) to add a new subtitle that includes specified provisions regarding: (1) an expansion of the limitation on deductions for lobbying expenditures, (2) a tax exemption for the production of kombucha, (3) an exclusion from gross income for certain gains from the sale or exchange of virtual currency, (4) and deductions and credits for expenditures in connection with marijuana sales conducted in compliance with state law.
Title
Directing the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make corrections in the enrollment of H.B. 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1089 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1810 (Related) 2017-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3708 (Related) 2017-09-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB389 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB777 (Related) 2017-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1810 (Related) 2017-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3708 (Related) 2017-09-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB389 (Related) 2017-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB777 (Related) 2017-03-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/97/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hconres97/BILLS-115hconres97ih.pdf |