US HCR95 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-20 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives and a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate. Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, November 19, 2015, through Wednesday, November 25, 2015, it stand adjourned until 2:00 p.m. on Monday, November 30, 2015. Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, November 19, 2015, through Tuesday, November 24, 2015, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, November 30, 2015.
Title
Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives and a conditional recess or adjournment of the Senate.
Sponsors
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8175; text as passed Senate: CR S8175) |
2015-11-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-19 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8402) |
2015-11-19 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8402) |
2015-11-19 | House | Introduced in House |