US HCR91 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal collectively to the Chinese-American veterans of World War II. This concurrent resolution authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on April 29, 2020, for a ceremony to present a Congressional Gold Medal collectively to the Chinese-American veterans of World War II in recognition of their dedicated wartime service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to present the Congressional Gold Medal collectively to the Chinese-American veterans of World War II.

Sponsors

Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-03-11SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1710)
2020-03-05SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-03-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-04HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1485)
2020-03-04HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1484-1485)
2020-03-04HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
2020-03-04HouseMs. Lofgren asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2020-02-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
2020-02-25HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback