US HCR91 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of Congress that public health professionals should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States on "Public Health Thank You Day", November 20, 2017. Expresses the sense of Congress that public health professionals are to be celebrated, commended, and thanked on Public Health Thank You Day for their profoundly important contributions to the nation.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that public health professionals should be commended for their dedication and continued service to the United States on "Public Health Thank You Day", November 20, 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR141 (Same As) 2018-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/91/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hconres91/BILLS-115hconres91ih.pdf |