US HCR90 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-10-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Condemning ethnic cleansing of the Rohingya and calling for an end to the attacks in and an immediate restoration of humanitarian access to the state of Rakhine in Burma. Condemns the attacks against civilians by Burma's security services and calls on Burma's Commander-in-Chief, Min Aung Hlaing, to end such attacks in the state of Rakhine. Expresses appreciation to the government of Bangladesh for providing refuge to those fleeing violence. Condemns the Arakan Rohingya Salvation Army attacks but warns that these attacks do not justify the response that has resulted in severe human rights violations and atrocities against civilians. Calls on Burma's government and military and security forces to: (1) implement the recommendations of the Advisory Commission on Rakhine State, and (2) allow humanitarian access to refugees and internally displaced persons. Urges support and access for the United Nations Fact Finding Mission to Burma. Calls on Burma's military and government to allow refugees to return to Burma and to change laws and policies that have contributed to insecurity in Rakhine. Calls on the President to impose sanctions on those responsible for human rights abuses, including members of Burma's military and security services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning ethnic cleansing of the Rohingya and calling for an end to the attacks in and an immediate restoration of humanitarian access to the state of Rakhine in Burma.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended (Y: 423 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2017-12-06HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 3 (Roll no. 664). (text: CR 12/5/2017 H9643)
2017-12-06HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (CR H9703-9704)
2017-12-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-12-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 90.
2017-12-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9643-9648)
2017-12-05HouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2017-11-15HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-11-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback