US HCR90 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the printing as a Senate document of the 25th edition of the pocket version of the U.S. Constitution. Prescribes requirements in each chamber for distribution of copies of the printed document for their respective use.
Title
Authorizing the printing of the 25th edition of the pocket version of the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5627-5628) |
2012-02-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2012-02-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-02-01 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H314) |
2012-02-01 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H314) |
2012-02-01 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2012-02-01 | House | Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2011-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |