US HCR89 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 83-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-13 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-13 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to the United States economy. Expresses the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to American families and businesses and is not in the best interest of the United States.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to the United States economy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-10 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 237 N: 163 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-06-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-10 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 237 - 163, 2 Present (Roll no. 295). (text: CR H3669) |
2016-06-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3693) |
2016-06-10 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At conclusion of debate on H.Con.Res. 89, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Black demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the resolution until later in the legislative day. |
2016-06-10 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H3676) |
2016-06-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Con. Res. 89. |
2016-06-10 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4775, H. Con. Res. 89, and H. Con. Res. 112. |
2016-06-10 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 767. (consideration: CR H3669-3677) |
2016-06-07 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 767 Reported to House. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4775, H. Con. Res. 89, and H. Con. Res. 112. |
2015-10-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-10-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR472 (Related) 2016-05-24 - Referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3102-3103)
HR767 (Related) 2016-06-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR767 (Related) 2016-06-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Energy prices
Oil and gas
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
User charges and fees
Energy prices
Oil and gas
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
User charges and fees