US HCR86 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-31 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution provides for a joint session of Congress on February 4, 2020, to receive a message from the President.
Title
Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.
Sponsors
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S751) |
2020-01-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-28 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H607) |
2020-01-28 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H607) |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR9 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional operations and organization
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Congressional operations and organization
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents