US HCR85 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

- (Sec. 601) Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives on: (1) veterans' and servicemembers' health care; (2) homeland security; (3) American innovation and economic competitiveness; (4) pay parity; (5) college affordability; (6) Great Lakes restoration; and (7) the importance of child support enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Setting forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 2010 and including the appropriate budgetary levels for fiscal years 2009 and 2011 through 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-02 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 233 N: 196 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - On agreeing to the Woolsey amendment (A001) H.Amdt.72 (Y: 84 N: 348 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-02 - House - On agreeing to the Ryan (WI) amendment (A004) H.Amdt.75 (Y: 137 N: 293 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-04-02 - House - On agreeing to the Lee (CA) amendment (A003) H.Amdt.74 (Y: 113 N: 318 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-02 - House - On agreeing to the Jordan (OH) amendment (A002) H.Amdt.73 (Y: 111 N: 322 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-02HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2009-04-02HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 196 (Roll no. 192). (text: CR H4431-4437)
2009-04-02HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H4487)
2009-04-02HouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H. Con. Res. 85.
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.75 On agreeing to the Ryan (WI) amendment (A004) Failed by recorded vote: 137 - 293 (Roll no. 191).
2009-04-02HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 316, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the Ryan (WI) amendment in the nature of a substitute.
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.75 Amendment (A004) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Ryan (WI). (consideration: CR H4469-4487; text: CR H4469-4478)
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.74 On agreeing to the Lee (CA) amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 113 - 318, 1 Present (Roll no. 190).
2009-04-02HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 316, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the Lee(CA) amendment in the nature of a substitute.
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.74 Amendment (A003) in the nature of a substitute offered by Ms. Lee (CA). (consideration: CR H4460-4469; text: CR H4460-4461)
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.73 On agreeing to the Jordan (OH) amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 111 - 322 (Roll no. 189).
2009-04-02HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 316, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the Jordan(OH) amendment in the nature of a substitute.
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.73 Amendment (A002) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Jordan (OH). (consideration: CR H4446-4460; text: CR H4446-4453)
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.72 On agreeing to the Woolsey amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 84 - 348 (Roll no. 188).
2009-04-02HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 316, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on the Woolsey amendment in the nature of a substitute.
2009-04-02HouseH.Amdt.72 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Ms. Woolsey. (consideration: CR H4437-4446; text: CR H4437-4440)
2009-04-02HouseThe House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
2009-04-02HouseGENERAL LEAVE - Mr. Spratt asked unanimous consent that Members have 5 legislative days to revise and extend their remarks on H.Con.Res. 85. Agreed to without objection.
2009-04-02HouseCommittee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H. Con. Res. 85 as unfinished business.
2009-04-02HouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with the remaining one hour of general debate on H. Con. Res. 85.
2009-04-02HouseThe House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
2009-04-02HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4415-4487)
2009-04-02HouseCommittee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H. Con. Res. 85 as unfinished business.
2009-04-02HouseOn motion that the Committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
2009-04-02HouseMrs. Maloney moved that the Committee rise.
2009-04-01HouseGENERAL DEBATE - General Debate on H. Con. Res. 85 continued beyond 12 midnight and on into April 2, 2009.
2009-04-01HouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with four hours of general debate on H. Con. Res. 85.
2009-04-01HouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Ellen O. Tauscher to act as Chairwoman of the Committee.
2009-04-01HouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 305 and Rule XVIII.
2009-04-01HouseRule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 85 with 4 hours of general debate. The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the concurrent resolution.
2009-04-01HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 305. (consideration: CR H4370-4393)
2009-04-01HouseRule H. Res. 305 passed House.
2009-03-31HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 305 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 85 with 4 hours of general debate. The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the concurrent resolution.
2009-03-27HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 25.
2009-03-27HouseThe House Committee on The Budget reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-60, by Mr. Spratt.

Same As/Similar To

HR305 (Related)
HR316 (Related)
SCR13 (Related) 2009-04-29 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects

Appropriations
Arms control and nonproliferation
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Child health
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Disability assistance
Economic performance and conditions
Economics and public finance
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial crises and stabilization
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Great Lakes
Health care quality
Higher education
Home and outpatient care
Homeland security
House Committee on Education and Labor
House Committee on Energy and Commerce
House Committee on Ways and Means
Housing and community development funding
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
Medicare
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Guard and reserves
Nutrition and diet
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Roads and highways
Sales and excise taxes
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Small business
Social security and elderly assistance
Student aid and college costs
Tax treatment of families
Terrorism
Transfer and inheritance taxes
Transportation programs funding
Unemployment
Veterans' medical care
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Women's health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback