US HCR77 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-04 - Rule H. Res. 739 passed House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-04 - Rule H. Res. 739 passed House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution directs the President to remove the Armed Forces from hostilities in Syria, except for those engaged in operations against al Qaeda or associated forces, unless a declaration of war or specific authorization has been enacted.
Title
Directing the President pursuant to section 5(c) of the War Powers Resolution to remove United States Armed Forces from hostilities in the Syrian Arab Republic that have not been authorized by Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | House | Rule H. Res. 739 passed House. |
2019-12-03 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 739 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 and H. Con. Res. 77. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 under a structured rule, and makes in order that a motion to discharge H. Con. Res. 77 shall be in order on December 11, 2019. |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-11-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR70 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HR739 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR739 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
International affairs
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Syria
War and emergency powers
International affairs
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Syria
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/77/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hconres77/BILLS-116hconres77ih.pdf |