US HCR74 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-08 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-08 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a joint session of Congress on September 8, 2011, to receive a message from the President.
Title
Providing for a joint session of Congress to receive a message from the President.
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5392) |
2011-09-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-09-07 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5942) |
2011-09-07 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5942) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR10 (Related) 2011-01-25 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.