US HCR73 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the need to improve physical access to many federally funded facilities for all people of the United States, particularly people with disabilities.
Title
Recognizing the need to improve physical access to many federally funded facilities for all people of the United States, particularly people with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR29 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S796)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/73/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hconres73/BILLS-117hconres73ih.pdf |