US HCR73 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution expresses the sense of Congress that public health professionals are to be celebrated, commended, and thanked on Public Health Thank You Day for their profoundly important contributions to the nation.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that public health professionals should be commended for their dedication and service to the United States on Public Health Thank You Day, November 25, 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-11-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR124 (Related) 2020-11-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/73/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hconres73/BILLS-116hconres73ih.pdf |