US HCR61 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the 2nd Annual Fallen Firefighters Congressional Flag Presentation Ceremony. Permits the Congressional Fire Services Institute and the National Fallen Firefighters Foundation to sponsor the 2nd Annual Fallen Firefighters Congressional Flag Presentation Ceremony as a free public event on the Capitol grounds on September 30, 2015, to honor the firefighters who died in the line of duty in 2014.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the 2nd Annual Fallen Firefighters Congressional Flag Presentation Ceremony.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-07-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR73 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/61/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hconres61/BILLS-114hconres61ih.pdf |