US HCR59 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia .
Pending: House Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia .
Pending: House Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) it is U.S. policy to support Israel in maintaining secure, recognized, and defensible borders; and (2) it is contrary to U.S. policy and our national security to have Israel's borders return to the armistice lines of June 4, 1967.
Title
Declaring that it is the policy of the United States to support and facilitate Israel in maintaining defensible borders and that it is contrary to United States policy and national security to have the borders of Israel return to the armistice lines that existed on June 4, 1967.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] |
Rep. Nan Hayworth [R-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. John Sullivan [R-OK] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] | Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia . |
2011-06-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR23 (Same As) 2011-06-09 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3694)
Subjects
Arab-Israeli relations
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/59/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hconres59/BILLS-112hconres59ih.pdf |