US HCR55 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the President, pursuant to section 5(c) of the War Powers Resolution, to remove United States Armed Forces deployed to Iraq or Syria on or after August 7, 2014, other than Armed Forces required to protect United States diplomatic facilities and personnel, from Iraq and Syria. Directs the President to remove U.S. Armed Forces deployed to Iraq or Syria on or after August 7, 2014, other than Armed Forces required to protect U.S. diplomatic facilities and personnel, from Iraq and Syria: (1) no later than 30 days after this concurrent resolution is adopted; or (2) if the President determines that it is not safe to remove the Armed Forces before that date, then no later than December 31, 2015, or such earlier date as the President determines that the Armed Forces can safely be removed.
Title
Directing the President, pursuant to section 5(c) of the War Powers Resolution, to remove United States Armed Forces deployed to Iraq or Syria on or after August 7, 2014, other than Armed Forces required to protect United States diplomatic facilities and personnel, from Iraq and Syria.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 139 N: 288 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-17 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 139 - 288, 1 Present (Roll no. 370). |
2015-06-17 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House. (consideration: CR H4470) |
2015-06-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with two hours of debate on H. Con. Res. 55. |
2015-06-17 | House | Considered pursuant to a previous order. (consideration: CR H4455-4471; text of measure as introduced: CR H4455-4456) |
2015-06-17 | House | Consideration initiated pursuant to a previous order. |
2015-06-16 | House | ORDER OF BUSINESS - Mr. Collins (GA) asked unanimous consent that it be in order at any time to consider H. Con. Res. 55 in the House if called up by the chair of the Committee on Foreign Affairs or his designee; that the concurrent resolution be considered as read; and that the previous question be considered as ordered on the concurrent resolution to adoption without intervening motion or demand for division of the question, except for 2 hours of debate equally divided between the majority and minority. Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-06-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3906-3908, H3908-3909) |
2015-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR57 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Syria
War and emergency powers
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Syria
War and emergency powers