US HCR54 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the reprinting of the 25th edition of the pocket version of the United States Constitution. Authorizes the printing as a House document of the 25th edition of the pocket version of the U.S. Constitution. Prescribes requirements in each chamber for distribution of copies of the printed document for their respective use.
Title
Authorizing the reprinting of the 25th edition of the pocket version of the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4117) |
2015-06-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-10 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4032) |
2015-06-10 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4032) |
2015-06-10 | House | Mr. Davis, Rodney asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H4032) |
2015-06-10 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2015-06-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congress
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Government information and archives
House of Representatives
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Government information and archives
House of Representatives