US HCR48 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives. Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, April 6, 2017, through Friday, April 21, 2017, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, April 25, 2017.
Title
Providing for a conditional adjournment of the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-04-06 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2782) |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2782) |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |