US HCR47 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of the Capitol grounds for the 26th Annual District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run on June 3, 2011.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR67 (Related) 2011-09-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR118 (Related) 2012-05-10 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR118 (Related) 2012-05-10 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/47/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hconres47/BILLS-112hconres47ih.pdf |