US HCR43 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the efforts of the late Representative Walter B. Jones to promote military working dogs as unsung heroes on the battlefield and in helping wounded warriors recover from physical and mental injuries. It recognizes the service of, and honors the sacrifices made by, these dogs and soldier handlers from the tactical explosive detection dog program.
Title
Recognizing the honorable service of military working dogs and soldier handlers in the tactical explosive detection dog program of the Army and encouraging the Army and other government agencies, including law enforcement agencies, with former tactical explosive detection dogs to prioritize adoption of the dogs to former tactical explosive detection dog handlers.
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Firearms and explosives
House of Representatives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mammals
Members of Congress
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
North Carolina
Service animals
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Firearms and explosives
House of Representatives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mammals
Members of Congress
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
North Carolina
Service animals
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/43/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hconres43/BILLS-116hconres43ih.pdf |