US HCR43 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds, the rotunda of the Capitol, and Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for official Congressional events surrounding the visit of His Holiness Pope Francis to the United States Capitol. Authorizes the use of the Capitol grounds, the rotunda of the Capitol, and Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on Thursday, September 24, 2015 for official congressional events surrounding the visit of His Holiness Pope Francis to the U.S. Capitol.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds, the rotunda of the Capitol, and Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for official Congressional events surrounding the visit of His Holiness Pope Francis to the United States Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3006) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-04-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-30 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2685) |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2685) |
2015-04-30 | House | Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H2685) |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. (consideration: CR H2685) |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR42 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.